Hoffmann et al v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Kasey F. Hoffmann and Casey M. Simoni
Defendant: Kevin Jones and Dean F. Growden
Case Number: 2:2015cv01748
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/7/2018 GRANTING 54 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his objections. (Henshaw, R)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/10/2018 RECOMMENDING defendant's 40 motion for summary judgment be granted; and the Clerk be directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/3/2018 DENYING 39 Motion to Compel and DENYING both parties' request for sanctions. (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/22/18 ADOPTING 36 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING 26 Motion for injunctive relief. (Kaminski, H)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/29/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this case and RECOMMENDING that the 26 Motion for Injunctive Relief be denied. Referred to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (York, M)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/14/17 STRIKING 29 , 30 , 31 the supplements and declaration. The clerk is directed to make a notation on the docket. The motion for leave for additional interrogatories 17 and the motions to compel 19 , 20 are deemed submitted. The court will not consider further filings from plaintiff in support of these motions. (Plummer, M)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kasey F. Hoffmann signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/20/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffmann et al v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey F. Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey M. Simoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean F. Growden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?