Williams v. Agredano, et al.
Plaintiff: |
Lonnie Williams |
Defendant: |
R. Agredano, A. Chavez, L. Mercado, G. Gonsalez, I. Igbokwe, E. Rodriguez, M. Jimenez, J. Lewis and R. Griffin |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01767 |
Filed: |
August 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 12, 2016 |
Filing
30
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/12/2016 VACATING defendants' 26 motion for summary judgment; and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/16 ORDERING that defendants' motion to modify the scheduling order (ECF No. 27 ) is GRANTED; The dispositive motion deadline is extended from August 5, 2016, to December 2, 2016.(Dillon, M)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/20/16 granting 24 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to attend her deposition. (Plummer, M)
|
April 11, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/16 GRANTING 21 Motion to quash.(Dillon, M)
|
March 24, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/24/16 ordering that plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief 18 , 20 , in which she seeks permission to conduct discovery are denied. (Plummer, M)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
10
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/30/15 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Lonnie Williams and forward payment to the court until the balance i s paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/31/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint.(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?