Ribeiro-Sunglow LLC, et al v. Umpqua Bank
Plaintiff: |
Ribeiro-Sunglow, LLC and Ribeiro California II, LLC |
Defendant: |
Umpqua Bank |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01853 |
Filed: |
September 1, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 6, 2017 |
Filing
23
STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Complaint and Counterclaim With Prejudice signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/6/17. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
|
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
20
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/12/17 ORDERING that Designation of Expert Witnesses due 6/13/2017, Supplemental Expert Disclosure due 6/27/2017, Joint Mid-Litigaiton Statement to be filed by 6/27/2017, All Disco very to be Completed by 7/11/2017, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/22/2017, Date for Hearing on all Dispositive Motions is 9/19/2017 at 1:30 p.m., Joint Pretrial Statement to be filed by 10/27/2017. Final Pretrial Conference SET for 11/3/2017 at 10:00 AM, and Trial SET for 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/12/2016 ORDERING Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 2/13/2017, Supplemental Expert Disclosure by 2/27/2017; Joint Mid-Litigation Statement by 2/27/2017; Discovery due by 3/6/2017; Dispositive Mot ions filed by 4/18/2017, Date for hearing on all dispositive motions for 5/16/2017 at 1:30; Joint Pretrial Statement by 6/30/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; and Court Trial set for 8/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.(Reader, L)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
15
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/8/2016 ORDERING that the parties shall make expert witness disclosures no later than 9/16/2016, and that any supplemental disclosure and disclosure of any rebuttal shall be made by 9/23/2016. (Zignago, K.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?