Villescas v. Miranda et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Villescas
Defendant: Rafael Miranda, R. Lankford, Bonnie Lee, Dorothy Swingle, J. Lewis, E. Ehrman, Thomas J. Mahoney, J. Smith and Gerri Milliken
Case Number: 2:2015cv01861
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/23/2017 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED. (Donati, J)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/14/2017 ORDERING that defendants notify this court, within 7 days, whether they have any objection to the dismissal of htis action. (Yin, K)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/6/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 60 request for an extension of time. Plaintiff shall file any objections to the 11/15/2016 findings and recommendations by 2/20/2017. (Yin, K)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/14/2016 RECOMMENDING the 39 motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part in accordance with these findings and recommendations; plaintiff's request for injunctive relief be denied as moot; the motion to dismiss be denied in all other respects; and plaintiff be granted leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of a decision on these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/28/16 ORDERING that 43 Motion to modify the scheduling order is GRANTED; Discovery is stayed and the September 9, 2016 dispositive motion deadline is VACATED; the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines will be reset following resolution of the pending motion to dismiss.(Dillon, M)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/12/16 ORDERING that the Clerk shall file the Response to Plaintiffs Objections to the Findings and Recommendations and the Supplemental Declaration of D. Greenleaf, M.D., under seal. The Court will review the documents in camera in relation to Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 11 ), and they will be destroyed or returned to the Attorney Generals Office at the close of this case.(Dillon, M)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/30/2015 ORDERING the Clerk to serve these findings and recommendations on Deputy Attorney General Martha Ehlenbach. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 11 motion for a temporary restraining order, and plaintiff's 17 supplemental briefing in support of this motion be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/9/2015 ORDERING Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson to address the plaintiff's 11 Motion for Injunctive Relief; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this order and a copy of the 11 Motion for Injunctive Relief Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson. (cc: Attorney General PC - Monica Anderson) (Michel, G.)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Alberto Villescas signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/9/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villescas v. Miranda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Villescas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Ehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerri Milliken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?