Garcia v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Garcia
Defendant: Bonnie Lee, R. Lankford, S. Abdur-Rahman, R. Miranda, J. Lewis and J. Hogue
Case Number: 2:2015cv01888
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/27/2017. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/02/17 ordering ( Settlement Conference set for 8/29/2017 at 11:30 AM at High Desert State Prison before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison.) Each party shall provide a confidential settlement statement to Sujean Park, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, California 95814, or via e-mail at spark@caed.uscourts.gov, so they arrive no later than August 22, 2017, and file a Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement. (See Local Rule 270(d)) The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Litigation Office atHDSP via facsimile at (530) 251-5031. (cc: CMK). (Plummer, M)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/22/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed January 5, 2017, are ADOPTED in full; Defendant's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 32 ) is DENIED; and this action is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further scheduling. (Becknal, R)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/5/17 RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 32 ) be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/10/16 ordering discovery in this matter is stayed until the district court issues a final ruling on the defendant's 8/05/16 motion for summary judgment. The discovery and pretrial motion cut off dates set forth in the Discovery and Scheduling Order issued on 6/28/16 are hereby vacated. The court will reset those dates if defendant's motion for summary judgment is denied. (Plummer, M)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/28/16 ordering The parties shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, inform the courts Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) division, in writing, if they believe a settlement confere nce would be beneficial, at the following address, fax number, or email address: ADR Division Attention: Sujean Park U.S. District Court 501 I Street, Suite 4-200 Sacramento, CA 95814 Fax: (916) 491-3912 Email: spark@caed.uscourts.gov. (cc: ADR Division)(Plummer, M) Modified on 6/28/2016 (Plummer, M).
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/29/16: The findings and recommendations filed January 27, 2016, are adopted in full. This action is dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants except Hogue. (Kaminski, H)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/27/2016 ORDERING that service is appropriate for J. Hogue; the Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed with prejudice to all defendants except Hogue. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to the F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/10/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 11 motion for leave to comply with local rules and 12 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Carlos J. Garcia signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/15/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwar d to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Abdur-Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?