Hill v. Holland
Petitioner: Donald Jesse Hill
Respondent: K. Holland
Case Number: 2:2015cv01912
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/2018 DENYING 44 Motion for Reconsideration. (Washington, S)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/1/17 GRANTING 24 Motion for Extension of time. The parties may file objections to the findings and recommendations within 30 days of the date of this order.(Dillon, M)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/7/17 RECOMMENDING that respondent's motion to dismiss (Doc. 12 ) be granted and the petition be dismissed as filed beyond the statute of limitations. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Jesse Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?