Boggs v. Victoria's Secret et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Boggs
Defendant: Victoria's Secret, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., L. Brands Store Design and Construction, Inc., L. Brands Direct Fulfillment, Inc and L. Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01920
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/4/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for filing of dispositional settlement documents is hereby EXTENDED to 3/3/2017. (Zignago, K.)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/1/16: Defendant shall produce to plaintiff a copy of the store security video at issue prior to plaintiffs deposition. Because plaintiff's deposition is presently scheduled for July 7, 2016, defendant shall produce the copy of the video to plaintiff no later than 4:00 p.m. on July 5, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/14/2016. (Michel, G.)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/6/16 ORDERING that the parties' proposed stipulated protective order 19 is DISAPPROVED, but without prejudice to submission of an amended version. (Becknal, R)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER Correcting 11 Order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/2016 ORDERING that the 10 stipulated request for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. 11 Order is amended as follows: Plaintiff Barbara Boggs may file an amended complaint omitting the defendants referred to in the parties stipulation as the "improper defendants" and including Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC as a defendant. Upon the filing of such an amended complaint, the impro per defendants will be dismissed without prejudice. No other amendments, changes, revisions, additions, or deletions of parties, claims or otherwise may be made to the amended complaint save for the addition and deletion of the parties described in the parties' stipulation. (Zignago, K.)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/8/2016 CONTINUING the Settlement Conference to 8/2/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Michel, G.)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/16 ORDERING the stipulated request for leave to file an amended complaint, ECF No. 10 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff Barbara Boggs may file an amended complaint omitting the defendants referred t o in the parties' stipulation as the "improper defendants" and including Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC as a defendant. Upon the filing of such an amended complaint, the improper defendants will be dismissed with prejudice. No other amendments, changes, revisions, additions, or deletions of parties, claims or otherwise may be made to the amended complaint save for the addition and deletion of the parties described in the parties' stipulation. (Becknal, R)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER 8 for continuance signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/11/2016. Settlement Conference is RE-SET for 5/6/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN). (Marciel, M)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/4/16: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/1/2016. Discovery due by 2/12/2016. Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 12/16/2016. Final Pretrial C onference set for 3/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Bench Trial set for 4/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Settlement Conference set for 2/17/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boggs v. Victoria's Secret et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Boggs
Represented By: Michael Christopher Kronlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret
Represented By: Richard R. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Brands Store Design and Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Brands Direct Fulfillment, Inc
Represented By: Richard R. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?