Hogan v. City of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: |
Diantae Hogan |
Defendant: |
City of Sacramento, Joseph Maydan and Daniel Piaz |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01933 |
Filed: |
September 11, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
22
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/17/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(b) and that the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case; REFERRING this matter to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that any objections be filed within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G.)
|
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/20/2017 ORDERING Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff shall pay to the Clerk of Court $250.00 in monetary sanctions based on his failure to appear at the status c onference, failure to comply with court orders, and failure to prosecute the case; Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed based on plaintiff's failure to appear at the status c onference, failure to comply with court orders, and failure to prosecute the case; failure to timely comply with all the provisions of this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). (Reader, L)
|
December 15, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/15/16 ORDERING Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. No later than 1/12/2017 the parties shall file a joint status rep ort. Failure to meaningfully participate in preparation of the joint status report and/or failure to appear at the status conference may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of the action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The parties are cautioned that unless and until the dates of the final pretrial conference and trial are continued by a subsequent court order, they should consider those dates firm.(Washington, S)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/25/16 ORDERING the motion 13 to withdraw is GRANTED. The hearing on the motion vacated. The Clerk is directed to serve this order on plaintiff at the address provided by counsel: 1530 Fulton Avenue, #53, Sacramento, California 95825. As plaintiff is now pro se, the case is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for future proceedings under Local Rule 302(c)(21). (Becknal, R)
|
February 3, 2016 |
Filing
11
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/3/16 ORDERING that if defense counsel does not accept service, plaintiff shall serve defendants Mayden and Piaz within 30 days of the scheduling conference. Initia l disclosures shall be completed within 30 days of the scheduling conference. All discovery shall be completed by 10/14/2016. Designation of Expert Witnesses due not later than 8/1/2016, with rebuttal expert disclosures due by 8/22/2016. All e xpert discovery shall be completed by 10/14/2016. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 11/18/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 4/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall confer and file a joint pretrial conference statement by 3/31/2017. The Jury Trial is SET for 6/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Trial briefs are due by 5/22/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?