Thomas v. Sacramento County et al
Plaintiff: Earl Thomas
Defendant: Sacramento County, Scott R. Jones, S. Daniels, Fidler, Corpral McKersey, Serg Kerez, Ares Management, LLC and 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01952
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/28/2019 ORDERING the deadlines RESET as follows: Discovery due by 9/25/2019, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/22/2019, with Expert Rebuttal due by 12/13/2019, Dispositive Mo tions to be heard by 5/14/2020, Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 7/16/2020. The Pretrial Conference is reset for 7/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley, and Trial is reset for 9/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Huang, H)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/10/2018 ORDERING the following deadline and trial dates CONTINUED: Fact discovery cut-off 4/26/2019; Expert disclosure 6/28/2019; Expert rebuttal 7/18/2019; Hearing of dispositive mot ions 12/5/2019; Joint pretrial conference statement 2/13/2020; Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 2/20/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Jury Trial CONTINUED to 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Washington, S)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 02/28/18 CONTINUING dates as follows: all Discovery shall be completed by 01/25/19; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 03/29/19, expert rebuttal due 04/18/19 and expert discovery c ut-off 05/17/19; Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 09/05/19; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/19 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley with a joint pretrial statement due 11/07/19; Jury Trial set for 01/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley with trial briefs due 01/13/2020. (Benson, A.)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/24/17 ORDERING that Non-Government Defendants shall file their answers to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 04/17/17. (Benson, A)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/20/17: County Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before April 17, 2017.(Kaminski, H)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2017 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 16 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a first amended complaint within thirty (30) days. (Michel, G.)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/19/15 ORDERING that the hearing for Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS 16 is SET for 2/11/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley with Plaintiff's opposition due on 1/28/16, and Defendants' reply due on 2/4/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/15/15 ORDERING that defendants have until 11/6/2015 to file and their responsive pleading. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Sacramento County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Thomas
Represented By: Celia L. McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Represented By: Kelley Suzanne Elkins Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Jones
Represented By: Kelley Suzanne Elkins Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Daniels
Represented By: Kelley Suzanne Elkins Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidler
Represented By: Kelley Suzanne Elkins Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpral McKersey
Represented By: Kelley Suzanne Elkins Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serg Kerez
Represented By: Richard Giles Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ares Management, LLC
Represented By: Richard Giles Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC
Represented By: Richard Giles Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?