Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Lopez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv02080
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/9/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of FIVE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($5,000.00) under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA). (Zignago, K.)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/7/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 13 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Defendant's 15 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/29/15 ORDERING that 2 plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social securit y cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the required documents for service. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?