Gardner v. Six Flags Discovery Kingdom et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Gardner
Defendant: Six Flags Discovery Kingdom and Peppino Messina
Case Number: 2:2015cv02085
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/7/2018 ORDERING that the courts June 7, 2018 findings and recommendations 27 recommending dismissal for failure to file a timely amended complaint are VACATED. RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without leave to amend and the Clerk be directed to close the case. Within fourteen days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Cannarozzi, N)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/7/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/02/18 ORDERING that plaintiffs second amended complaint 22 is dismissed with leave to amend within 30 days of the date this order is served.(Plummer, M)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/25/2017 GRANTING 19 Request to the extent that plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file an amended complaint. The court is unlikely to grant further extensions of time. (Hunt, G)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/5/2017 ORDERING the 5/3/2017 findings and recommendations 6 are VACATED; plaintiff's 11 motion for an extension of time to file an amended complaint is GRANTED; plaintiff's 6 /12/2017 amended complaint is deemed timely filed, but DISMISSED in light of plaintiff's request for another opportunity to amend; plaintiff's 13 motion for an extension of time to file a second amended complaint is GRANTED; plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 90 days, the court is not inclined to grant additional requests for extensions of time; and plaintiff's 10 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/03/17 ORDERING the Clerk is directed to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge William B. Shubb randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Six Flags Discovery Kingdom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Flags Discovery Kingdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peppino Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?