Cross Check Services, LLC v. Old Republic Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cross Check Services, LLC
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv02113
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/29/2019 GRANTING 24 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment Entered in Favor of Old Republic Insurance Company. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 02/15/18 ORDERING that by 02/28/18, the parties will file their joint exhibit list and joint statement of undisputed facts; by 03/15/18, each party will file and serve by email its opening brief and by 03/30/18 each party will file and serve by email its responding brief. (Benson, A.)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER re Trial Readiness signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/29/17. (Kaminski, H)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/19/2017 ORDERING 11 that the facts are estiblished for this litigation as read in this order; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that when Judgment is entered in this action, Judgment be entered in Old Republic's favor and against Cross Check on Cross Check's claim for the Attorneys' Fees Award. (Reader, L)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/21/16 ORDERING that the parties will engage in alternative dispute resolution proceedings on or before 2/15/17. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report up dating the Court as to the status and/or outcome of those proceedings on or before 3/1/17. That the Discovery completion date, with the exception of expert discovery, be continued from 11/14/16 to 4/21/2017. That the expert disclosure date be co ntinued from 1/13/17 to 3/31/2017. That the hearing date on Nationwide's MOTION for partial Summary Judgment [Dkt. 11 ] be CONTINUED from 12/1/16 to 5/18/17, and that the filing deadlines set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order [Dkt. 9 ] be calculated from the new hearing date. That the last date to hear dispositive Motions be CONTINUED from 5/18/17 to 7/27/2017.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross Check Services, LLC v. Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cross Check Services, LLC
Represented By: Douglas R. Alliston
Represented By: Louis A. Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?