Patterson v. Wong Do et al

Plaintiff: Vester L Patterson
Defendant: Sam Wong Do, N. Hashemi, J. Clark Kelso, C. Cryer, W. David Smiley, Jeffery Beard and J. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2015cv02117
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/01/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 15, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/13/2018 ADOPTING 13 Findings and Recommendations in full; Plaintiff's IFP status is REVOKED. Plaintiff shall pay the entire $400.00 in required fees within 30 days of service of this order or face dismissal of the case. (Fabillaran, J)
January 16, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/12/2018 GRANTING 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the service of this order in which to file his objections. (Fabillaran, J)
November 13, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/2017 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING Plaintiff's IFP status be revoked and Plaintiff be ordered to pay the entire $400.00 in required fees within 30 days or face dismissal of the case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 24, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/23/17 ordering that plaintiff shall have 30 days from the service of this order to file an amended complaint as outlined in the 4/28/17 screening order. (Plummer, M)
April 28, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/27/2017. CDCR is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. (cc: CDCR) (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Wong Do et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vester L Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Wong Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. David Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?