December 27, 2018 |
Filing
91
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/26/18 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiffs' 79 motion for default judgment, 88 amended motion for default judgment be granted, judgment be entered against defendant V anderbilt Commercial Lending, Inc., and defendant Gregory Cook, defendants' Vanderbilt Commercial Lending, Inc., and Gregory Cook be ordered to pay plaintiffs $4,770,000 in damages and this action be closed. Within 14 days after these findings and recommendations are filed, any party may file written objections with the court. Matter REFERRED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 9, 2018 |
Filing
87
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/6/2018 ORDERING 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Hearing is CONTINUED to 8/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; On or before 7/27/2018, plaintiffs shall file an amended motion for default judgment; On or before 7/27/2018, plaintiffs shall file proof of service of the amended motion on the defendants. (Reader, L)
|
June 8, 2018 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/7/2018 ORDERING 79 the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment is CONTINUED to 7/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; On or before 6/2 9/2018, plaintiffs shall comply with Local Rule 133(j); On or before 6/29/2018, plaintiffs shall submit an itemized statement in support of their request for costs; On or before 6/29/2018, plaintiffs shall amend their motion to provide specific citations to any relevant or referenced exhibits; and On or before 7/6/2018, plaintiffs shall proof of service of the amended filings on the defendants. (Reader, L)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
78
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/18 ORDERING for the foregoing reasons, the court GRANTS plaintiffs' motion to reopen discovery solely to renew their motion for sanctions. This resolves ECF No. 59 . (Becknal, R)
|
December 21, 2017 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/21/2017 ORDERING 66 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment is CONTINUED to 2/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; on or before 1/19/2018, plaintiffs shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing the status of defendant Gregory Cook and plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend. (Reader, L)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/17. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to enter the DEFAULT of Vanderbilt Commercial Lending, Inc. for failure to defend itself as required in this litigation. FRCP 55; L.R. 183. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to proceed with default judgment proceedings against Vanderbilt Commercial Lending, Inc. within thirty days. See L.R. 302(c)(19).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
August 22, 2017 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/21/2017 DENYING 52 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice to renewal; VACATING the hearing on said motion set for 8/25/2017. (Michel, G.)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing
47
AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/12/2017 ORDERING that discovery be completed by 7/21/2017; ORDERING all parties to disclose expert witnesses by 8/1/2017 and to disclose supplemental expert witnesses by 8/15/2017; ORDERING that expert discovery be completed by 8/31/2017; ORDERING that dispositive motions be heard by 9/22/2017; ORDERING the parties to file a joint pretrial conference statement by 12/22/2017 CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; VACATING the due dates for trial and trial briefs. (Michel, G.)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing
45
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/17/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for expert witness disclosures is EXTENDED through and including 7/1/2017, and the expert discovery cutoff date is EXTENDED through and including 8/31/2017. (Zignago, K.)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing
44
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/15/17: Discovery cutoff date is extended through and including June 29, 2017.(Kaminski, H)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
35
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/27/17 ORDERING that the ADR completion deadline is EXTENDED through and including 3/17/2017 to allow the parties to complete the ADR process. (Kastilahn, A)
|
April 18, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/15/16 ORDERING as follows: The Clerk's Entry of Default, entered on December 16, 2015, is hereby vacated; Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment, filed on January 13, 2016, is deemed withdrawn; Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint no later than 21 days after the Clerk's Entry of Default vacated. (Becknal, R)
|