Mason v. Montgomery
Petitioner: Christopher Mason
Respondent: W. L. Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2015cv02176
Filed: October 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 10/02/17 ORDERING the Clerk to TRANSFER Mason's 34 Motion to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (cc: USCA). (Benson, A.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 9/29/2017 DENYING as MOOT 33 Motion for leave to appeal IFP. (Washington, S)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 06/16/17 ORDERING that the Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED; the Court DECLINES to issue COA. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?