Mountjoy v. Bank of America, N.A.

Plaintiff: Calvin Mountjoy
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Seterus, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association and Recontrust
Case Number: 2:2015cv02204
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/27/18 ORDERING that, pursuant to 47 Stipulation, plaintiffs shall file a Third Amended Complaint by 05/07/18; defendants to file an answer or motion to dismiss within 21 days from plaintiffs filing of their Third Amended complaint. (Benson, A.)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/2018 GRANTING the parties stipulation for continuance. Plaintiffs shall file a Third Amended Complaint by 3/25/2018. Defendants to file an answer or motion to dismiss within 21 days from plaintiffs filing of their Third Amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/8/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff's first claim is DISMISSED without prejudice against Seterus and DISMISSED only insofar as it asserts a claim under § 2923.6 against BANA;Seterus's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's second claim is GRANTED with prejudice and BANA's motion to dismiss the second claim is GRANTED with leave to amend; Both Seterus and BANA's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's third claim are GRANTED with leave to amend; Seterus's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's fourth claim is GRANTED with prejudice and BANA's motion to dismiss the fourth claim is GRANTED with leave to amend; Seterus's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's fifth claim is GRANTED with prejudice and BANA's motion to dismiss the fifth claim is GRANTED with leave to amend; Both Seterus's and BANA's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's sixth claim are GRANTED with leave to amend; Seterus's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's seventh claim is DENIED; Both Seterus's and BANA's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's eighth claim are GRANTED with leave to amend; Both Seterus's and BANA's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's eleventh claim are GRANTED with leave to amend; Seterus's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's twelfth claim is DENIED and BANA's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's twelfth claim is GRANTED with leave to amend; Seterus's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's thirteenth claim is DENIED; and Defendant ReConTrust is DISMISSED in its entirety. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file a Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is not permitted leave to amend beyond the confines of this order. Defendants are afforded twenty-one (21) days from the date Plaintiff files an amended complaint to file an answer.(Becknal, R)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/31/2016 DENYING 27 Motion for TRO. (Donati, J)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/11/2016 DENYING 22 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Michel, G.)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/8/16. Should Plaintiff wish to file an amended complaint, such complaint must be filed within 30 days of the entry of this order. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountjoy v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Mountjoy
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Harrison
Represented By: Dennise Suzanne Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew Adam Garfinkle
Represented By: Marquis I. Wraight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?