Chambers v. Price et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Chambers
Defendant: Jerome Price, A. Zapata, D. Valadez and California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2015cv02274
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/2018 DENYING as moot 44 Request for Assistance Regarding the Settlement. (Henshaw, R)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/18/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 42 request for assistance in obtaining information regarding the status of his settlement. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/13/17 ORDERING the order and writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum issue on 8/29/17 is vacate. The Custodian shall produce Jerome Cha mbers on 12/20/17 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M) Modified on 9/13/2017 (Plummer, M).
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/28/2017 ORDERING the custodian to produce Jerome Chambers AT-6487, to testify before Judge Kendall J. Newman by video-conference at CMF on 12/20/2017 at 9:00 a. m. ; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: I.T. Dept.)(Yin, K)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 07/26/17 ORDERING that defendant Valadez is DISMISSED. (Benson, A)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/18/17. (Plummer, M)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/21/17 ORDERING the clerk of the court shall assign a district judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Valadez be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/5/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit a completed USM-285 form to effectuate service on defendant Valadez within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R) Modified on 5/5/2017 (Donati, J).
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/05/17 ordering the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, instruction sheet and a copy of the 11/02/15 complaint to be completed and returned with the Notice of Submission of Documents within 60 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/17 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send to the plaintiff 1 copy of the complaint. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the 3 copies of the complaint required to effect service. (Plummer, M)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/16 ordering plaintiff's first amended complaint is dismissed; plaintiff is granted 30 days to file a second amended complaint; if plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint within that time, the court will order service of the original complaint on defendants Zapata and Valadez. Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel 11 is denied. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/20/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Jerome Chambers and forward payment to the court until the balanc e is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?