July 11, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/2018 DENYING as moot 44 Request for Assistance Regarding the Settlement. (Henshaw, R)
|
May 18, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/18/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 42 request for assistance in obtaining information regarding the status of his settlement. (Yin, K)
|
September 13, 2017 |
Filing
38
AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/13/17 ORDERING the order and writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum issue on 8/29/17 is vacate. The Custodian shall produce Jerome Cha mbers on 12/20/17 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M) Modified on 9/13/2017 (Plummer, M).
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing
37
ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/28/2017 ORDERING the custodian to produce Jerome Chambers AT-6487, to testify before Judge Kendall J. Newman by video-conference at CMF on 12/20/2017 at 9:00 a. m. ; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: I.T. Dept.)(Yin, K)
|
July 27, 2017 |
Filing
32
ORDER ADOPTING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 07/26/17 ORDERING that defendant Valadez is DISMISSED. (Benson, A)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/18/17. (Plummer, M)
|
June 22, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/21/17 ORDERING the clerk of the court shall assign a district judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Valadez be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/5/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit a completed USM-285 form to effectuate service on defendant Valadez within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R) Modified on 5/5/2017 (Donati, J).
|
April 5, 2017 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/05/17 ordering the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, instruction sheet and a copy of the 11/02/15 complaint to be completed and returned with the Notice of Submission of Documents within 60 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/17 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send to the plaintiff 1 copy of the complaint. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the 3 copies of the complaint required to effect service. (Plummer, M)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/16 ordering plaintiff's first amended complaint is dismissed; plaintiff is granted 30 days to file a second amended complaint; if plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint within that time, the court will order service of the original complaint on defendants Zapata and Valadez. Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel 11 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
10
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/20/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Jerome Chambers and forward payment to the court until the balanc e is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
|