Schmuckley v. Kmart Corporation
Plaintiff: Loyd F. Schmuckley, Jr.
Defendant: Kmart Corporation
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America and State of California
Case Number: 2:2015cv02307
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/3/2018 ORDERING that all claims asserted in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to the States of Arkansas, Colorado, Delaware, Florida, Georgia, Hawaii, Illinois, Indiana, Iowa, Louisiana, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Montana, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, North Carolina, Oklahoma, Tennessee, Texas, Virginia, Washington and Wisconsin. (Zignago, K.)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/13/2018 ORDERING that All claims asserted in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice as to Relator;All claims asserted in this action for the Covered Conduct as that term is defined in the Sett lement Agreement between the U.S., California, Relator, and defendant Kmart Corporation, are DISMISSED with prejudice as to the U.S. and California All other claims asserted in this action are DISMISSED without prejudice as to the United States and California. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/7/2018 ORDERING that the 1 Complaint, United States' 29 Notice of Intervention, State of California's 30 Notice of Intervention and this Order are UNSEALED. All other previous filings remain under TEMPORARY SEAL pending further order of this court. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, any party may SHOW CAUSE, if any, as to why the balance of the documents in this action should not be unsealed. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmuckley v. Kmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loyd F. Schmuckley, Jr.
Represented By: Louisa O Kirakosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Catherine J. Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Emmanuel Ramon Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?