Reardon v. City of Chico et al
Plaintiff: Sean Patrick Reardon
Defendant: City of Chico, Michael A Dunbaugh, Michael O'Brien, Jack Ditty, Wayne Rockwell and Jeffrey Kozak
Case Number: 2:2015cv02410
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/30/2020, pursuant to 56 Stipulation, CONTINUING the cutoff date deadlines for Plaintiff's Opposition and Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition for 30 days in accordance with the original deadline dates. (Kastilahn, A)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/26/2020 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/6/2019 ORDERING that not later than 10 days following the date this Order is electronically filed, the parties are directed to file a joint status report advising the Court how they anticipate proceeding with this case. (Zignago, K.)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/3/18 DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 28 without prejudice to renewal once Plaintiff's appeal is resolved. All pending dates in this case are hereby VACATED, and this case is STAYED until Plaintiff's conviction is final. Not later than sixty days following the date this order is electronically filed, and every sixty days thereafter until the stay is lifted, the parties are directed to file a joint status report advising the Court regarding the status of Plaintiff's criminal proceedings. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 13 Motion for Extension of Time signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/31/17. (Kastilahn, A)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/9/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Brief in Support of the Motion to Extend [13-1] shall be sealed. Not later than three (3) days following the date this order is electronically filed, Plaintiff shall file his Amended Brief in Support of the Motion to Extend, which shall be the operative pleading for his motion. (Kastilahn, A)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/23/2017 ORDERING the Discovery cut-off date is CONTINUED to 3/31/2017. (Washington, S)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/03/2016 ORDERING that the Discovery Cut-off date is CONTINUED to 1/31/2017. (Butolph, J)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/13/2016 ORDERING that Defendants shall be allowed to depose Plaintiff Sean Patrick Reardon at Deuel Vocational Institution (DVI) located at 23500 Kasson Road,Tracy, CA 95376 prior to the discovery cut-off date. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reardon v. City of Chico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Patrick Reardon
Represented By: Ashley R. Amerio
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Fletterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Dunbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Ditty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?