Pin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nuth Pheakdey Pin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv02450
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/12/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff is awarded attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of $7252.99. (Zignago, K.)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/28/2017 GRANTING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; REMANDING this matter for further processing consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/1/16: Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment on or before August 16, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/20/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file her motion for summary judgment on or before 6/13/2016. (Zignago, K.)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/30/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk directed to serve a copy of Judge Brennan's Scheduling Order in Social Security cases and serve a copy of O rder on United States Marshal. Within 14 days from date of Order, plaintiff shall submit to United States Marshal the following: an original + 5 copies of completed Summons, 5 copies of Complaint, and 5 copies of Scheduling Order. Within 14 days from date of Order, plaintiff shall also file a Statement that said documents have been transmitted. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services] (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuth Pheakdey Pin
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?