Blight v. Manteca et al
Plaintiff: Joanne Blight
Defendant: City of Manteca, Armando Garcia, Ranch Johnson, Kirk Doty, Mike Keener, Ian Osborn, Armen Avakian, Paul Carmona and Chris S. Mraz
Case Number: 2:2015cv02513
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/29/2017 GRANTING 153 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal. (cc: USCA) (Zignago, K.)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/27/2017 DENYING 146 Defendants' Bill of Costs. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/18/17. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION and ORDER 132 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/7/2017 continuing 93 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication from 9/18/2017 to 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Defendants' deadline to file their reply is 9/18/2017 by Noon (12:00 p.m.). (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/1/2017 re: Filing Deadline for Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Donati, J)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/18/2017 GRANTING 114 Request to Seal Documents. (Michel, G.)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION and ORDER resetting dates 112 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/21/2017: 1) Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion 93 is continued from 8/7/2017 to 9/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; 2) the Final Pretrial Conference is continued from 8/28/2017 to 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and 3) the Jury Trial is continued from 10/17/2017 to 1/17/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/6/17, ORDERING that Defendants' request 107 to withdraw 95 Declaration and supporting exhibits is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE: REQUEST TO SEAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/28/17. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendants' request to seal certain information for their summary adjudication motion 91 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED Defendants are permitted to submit the requested information under seal. The information may be accessed only by the court, defendants, defense counsel, and plaintiff's counsel. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/21/2017: GRANTING in PART, SUBMITTED in PART 81 86 Motion to Compel insofar as defendants are ordered to arrange for the voluntary appearance of the CI at a deposition, or provide plaintiff wit h the information necessary to issue a subpoena, no later than 6/23/2017. The matter of sanctions remains under submission. Plaintiff shall submit a supplemental declaration regarding sanctions, no later than 21 days from entry of this order; defenda nts may reply no later than 7 days thereafter. DENYING 84 Motion for Protective Order. The scheduling order at 83 is AMENDED as follows: Paragraph 1 ( 83 at 3:12-4:6) is VACATED with the exception of the first sentence, which provides That the c urrent discovery cutoff of 6/6/2017 be extended until 6/23/2017. In light of the 6/30/2017, dispositive motions deadline, all further requests for modification of the scheduling order are to be brought directly before the District Judge. (Washington, S)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/1/2017 ORDERING that the current Discovery cutoff is EXTENDED until 6/23/2017 and the Dispositive Motion filing deadline is CONTINUED to 6/30/2017. (Zignago, K.)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/23/2017 DENYING 71 Defendants' Request for Reconsideration. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/5/2017: Defendants' request for reconsideration 62 of the Magistrate Judge's Order 55 is hereby DENIED without prejudice to defendants' right to re-file their request in a form consistent with this court's order of 3/22/2017 68 , within fourteen days from the date this Order is signed. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/21/17 ORDERING that defendants' request to seal is DENIED. Defendants' redacted request for reconsideration of the magistrate judge's ruling 62 and its supporting exhibits [62-1] are STRICKEN.(Kastilahn, A)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/21/17: Discovery due by 6/6/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/20/2017. Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial RESET for 10/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/21/17 ORDERING that defendants: Ranch Johnson, Mike Keener, Armen Avakian and Kirk Doty are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Becknal, R)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/9/2017 GRANTING 41 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (Reader, L)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/1/17. The parties are excused from filing a Joint Statement. The parties are permitted to file Separate Statements for the instant discovery dispute. (Kaminski, H)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/19/16; any provision in the parties' 36 Stipulation that is in conflict with anything in this order is DISAPPROVED. (Benson, A)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/12/2016 ORDERING that all discovery be completed by 2/9/2017. (Michel, G.)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/16/16 ORDERING that the Court's 11/07/16 26 Order is CONFIRMED; defendants shall provide plaintiff's counsel with access to a redacted version of Exhibit C, under the protections specified in the 26 Order. (Benson, A)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/08/2016 ORDERING that the deadline for expert disclosure is EXTENDED to 11/22/2016. The deadline for rebuttal expert disclosure is EXTENDED to 12/13/2016. The deadline for all discovery will remain 01/10/2017. (Butolph, J)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/04/2016 GRANTING, as limited Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Compel. (Jackson, T)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/2016 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Compel Discovery is CONTINUED to 11/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Reader, L)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/2016 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly refer this case to another magistrate judge for any further proceedings which may be appropriate or required. All dat es set in the above- entitled action before the undersigned are hereby VACATED. The case is randomly REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2-15-cv-2513 WBS AC. (Jackson, T) Modified on 10/18/2016 (Jackson, T).
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/30/16 ORDERING that defendant's 16 Request to Seal is GRANTED; Paragraphs 8-15 and 17-26 of Det. Garcia's declaration will be SEALED. (Benson, A)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/13/2016 ORDERING that the deadline for expert disclosure is EXTENDED to 11/8/2016. The deadline for rebuttal expert disclosure is EXTENDED to 11/29/2016. The deadline for all discovery remains unchanged; it closes on 1/10/2017. (Zignago, K.)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/13/2016. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blight v. Manteca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Blight
Represented By: Sanjay Stephen Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Manteca
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranch Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armen Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Carmona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris S. Mraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?