Gomez v. Braun et al.
Plaintiff: Nexis Rene Gomez
Defendant: D. Braun, N.D. Majumdar, A. Bowers and Dave Davey
Case Number: 2:2015cv02523
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/18 DENYING 59 Amended Motion to Amend as untimely. (Coll, A)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/17/18 DENYING 56 Motion to Amend. (Plummer, M)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/18/18 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to assign a district judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 43 be granted. Motion for Summary Judgment 43 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 46 motion for production of documents is DENIED as untimely; plaintiff's 46 request for discovery under Rule 56(d) is DENIED without prejudice; pla intiff's 47 motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; and plaintiff has up to and including 2/5/2018 to file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. (Yin, K)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/14/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 41 request for production of documents will be placed in the court file and DISREGARDED. Plaintiff is cautioned that further filing of discovery requests or responses, except as required by rule of court, may result in an order of sanctions, including, but not limited to, a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Yin, K)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/7/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 38 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/11/17 granting 36 motion to modify the discovery and scheduling order. Plaintiffs deposition is to be completed by June 14, 2017. Plaintiffs deposition is to be completed by June 14, 2017. Any discovery motion relative to the depositions listed above is to be filed by June 14, 2017. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before September 14, 2017. (Plummer, M)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/23/16. (Plummer, M)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/3/16 ORDERING that 25 Motion for Extension of time is PARTIALLY GRANTED; The parties are granted an additional 80 days in which to obtain and review plaintiff's medical records; on o r before 85 days from the date of this order, the assigned Deputy Attorney General shall contact Matt Caspar, Courtroom Deputy, at (916) 930-4187, to schedule the settlement conference, or file a request to opt out of the pilot project, consistent with this courts June 27, 2016 order (ECF No. 21 at 2); and the stay of this action is EXTENDED for an additional 90 days from the date of this order.(Dillon, M)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 90 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/27/2016. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy, Matt Caspar, within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) (Yin, K)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/31/2016 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 13 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/3/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Nexis Rene Gomez and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/8/15 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall provide plaintiff with another copy of the in forma pauperis application used by this court; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a fully completed in forma pauperis application. Plaintiffs failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Braun et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexis Rene Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.D. Majumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?