Nobles v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Derrick Nobles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv02525
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/17/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act 27 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $7,013.55 in attorney fees under 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d); Defendant is directed to mail the payment to Plaintiff's counsel. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 17, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/16/2017; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRNATING in part and DENYING in part 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; The Commissioner's decision is reversed; This matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order; The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
October 12, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/11/2016 ORDERING that time is EXTENDED for 30 days to 11/10/2016, for Plaintiff to file the Reply Brief. (Jackson, T)
July 6, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/6/16 ORDERING IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the parties, through their undersigned attorneys, to extend the time 30 days to August 8, 2016, for Plaintiff to file his Motion for Summary Judgment, in accordance with the Courts Scheduling Order. (Becknal, R)
May 24, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/24/16. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the parties, through their undersigned attorneys, to extend the time 45 days to July 7, 2016, for Plaintiff to file his Motion for Summary Judgment, in accordance with the Courts Scheduling Order. This is Plaintiffs first request for an extension for filing of the Opening Brief, which is requested because of Plaintiffs counsels recent poor health and family reasons, which have caused a backlog in her workload.(Dillon, M)
December 8, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/8/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 request to proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM within 14 days, and a statement thereafter with the court regarding submission. The USM is directed to serve process within 60 days. (cc: USM)(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nobles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Nobles
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Asim Modi, GOVT(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?