Fox v. Sherman
Petitioner: Michael Allahrae Fox
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 2:2015cv02561
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/25/2017 ORDERING the Clerk shall treat (ECF No. 27 ) as a notice of appeal and take action accordingly to process it to the Ninth Circuit. (cc: Ninth Circuit)(Yin, K)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/24/2017 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 23 request for appointment of counsel. Petitioner shall file his objections to the findings and recommendations, if any, not later than 5/12/2017. (Yin, K)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/9/2017 RECOMMENDING the petition be denied and no Certificate of Appealability be issued. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/22/16 DENYING 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/20/16 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer ; Respondents responsivepleading shall be filed on or before 5/18/2016. (Dillon, M)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/21/15 ORDERING that 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district; Petitioners application for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of this order; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner the courts form petition for writ of habeas corpus. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Allahrae Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?