Ford v. California Health Care Facility et al.
Plaintiff: Darren Vincent Ford
Defendant: California Health Care Facility and Jahangiri
Case Number: 2:2015cv02588
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/27/2018 VACATING 92 Findings and Recommendations, based on plaintiff's 93 Notice to Withdraw 87 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. (York, M)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/26/2018 RECOMMENDING 87 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/7/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 83 motion to disqualify the undersigned magistrate judge. (Yin, K)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/24/18 DENYING 80 Motion for a jury trial and for the appointment of counsel. (Plummer, M)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/11/2018 RECOMMENDING defendant's 61 motion for summary judgment be granted; and plaintiff's 77 , 78 motions to amend his complaint, for jury trial, and for the appointment of counsel be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/6/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 74 motion regarding discovery and a subpoena. (Yin, K)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 70 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/28/17. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/11/2017 DENYING 60 Motion for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off; DENYING 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and GRANTING 63 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to file response to 61 Motion for Summary Judgment by 8/18/2017. (Henshaw, R)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/20/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 55 motion for settlement is DENIED; plaintiff's 56 motion to dismiss is DENIED; and plaintiff's 57 motion for an extension of time is DENIED as unnecessary. (Yin, K)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/12/2017 DENYING 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel and DENYING 52 Motion for Extension of the Discovery Cut-off. (Henshaw, R)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/11/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 45 "Motion Pursuant to Rule 45(d)(3)(B) or Plaintiff would like to come to an agreement to settle case" is DENIED. Defendant's 47 mot ion to compel is GRANTED. Within 10 days, defendant shall serve an amended Request for Production of Documents, Set One, on plaintiff with appropriate instructions. Within 20 days of the date of service of the the Request for Production of Documents , Set One, plaintiff shall respond. Plaintiff is warned that if he fails to respond to the Request for Production, he may be sanctioned. Sanctions may include dismissal of this action. Defendant's request for sanctions is DENIED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/8/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's 40 motion for an extension of time to respond to defendant's discovery requests is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's special interrogatori es, set one, and requests for production of docuements no later than 2/28/2017. Defendant's 41 motion to compel is DENIED without prejudice. Defendant's 42 request for an extension of the discovery cut-off is GRANTED. Discovery due 4/14/2017. Plaintiff's 43 motion to object to the findings and recommendations is DENIED as untimely. Plaintiff's 43 motion for summary judgment is DENIED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/24/2017 ADOPTING in FULL 35 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING motions for injunctive relief 32 34 . (Washington, S)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/12/2016 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 33 motion for an extension of time. If plaintiff seeks an extension of time, in addition to showing good cause, plaintiff must tell the court when his responses are due and how much additional time he seeks to resond. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 32 , 34 motions for injunctive relief be denied for the reasons set forth in these F&R. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 09/01/16 denying 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/28/16 DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/16/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Darren Vincent Ford and forward payment to the court until the bala nce is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/23/15 ORDERING that within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file the required affidavit in support of his application to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may result in recommendation of dismissal. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. California Health Care Facility et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Vincent Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Health Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jahangiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?