Benyamini v. Terry et al.

Plaintiff: Robert Benyamini
Defendant: Terry, Stockton and Eos
Case Number: 2:2015cv02615
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/03/17 DENYING 34 Motion for Reconsideration. (Benson, A.)
September 21, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/2017 RECOMMENDING 24 Motion to Dismiss be granted, all outstanding motions be denied, and the Clerk be directed to close the case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
April 21, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/20/17 ordering that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of no opposition. (Plummer, M)
February 14, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/13/2017 ORDERING the defendants to file a responsive pleading or motion within thirty (30) days; DEFERRING ruling on the defendants' 14 Motion for an Order Declaraing Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant pending receipt of the defendants' Answer and resolution of any motion under Rule 12 or Rule 56. (Michel, G.)
November 16, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/16 ORDERING that within 30 days from the date of this order, defendants shall file a responsive pleading or motion in accordance with Rule 12 (or if appropriate Rule 56). Ruling on defend ants' motion for an order declaring plaintiff a vexatious litigant (ECF No. 14 ) is deferred pending the resolution of any Rule 12 or Rule 56 motion. The Clerk shall terminate ECF No. 14 . With any answer, defendants may file a notice of renewal. (Dillon, M)
July 26, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/25/16 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to defendants motion or a statement of no opposition. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
January 5, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/4/16 ORDERING that plaintiff has 30 days from the date of service of this order to submit either the filing fee or the application required by § 1915(a). The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benyamini v. Terry et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Benyamini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?