Pierce v. Sacramento News & Review et al
Plaintiff: Seavon Pierce
Defendant: Sacramento News & Review, Bay Area Press, Vallejo Times Herald and San Jose Mercury News
Case Number: 2:2015cv02650
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/18/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/30/17, DENYING Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Reconsideration. (Kastilahn, A)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/17, ADOPTING IN PART 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 3 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Plaintiff shall pay the full amount of the $400.00 filing fee for this action within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the action without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/11/17 recommending that plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 3 be denied. This action be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of the filing fees. MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS 3 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Sacramento News & Review et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seavon Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento News & Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallejo Times Herald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Mercury News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?