Christensen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karl E. Christensen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv02658
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/18/17. (Kaminski, H)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/8/2017 ORDERING that the defendant shall file a response to the 25 motion for attorney's fees not later than 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 14 days from the date defendant's response is filed. (Zignago, K.)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/9/17: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 19 , is GRANTED.The Commissioner's cross-motion for summary judgment 22 , is DENIED. This matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. (Kaminski, H)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/7/16: The deadline for Defendant to file her response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgments is extended thirty (30) days to November 9, 2016. All other deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order 5 remain the same. (Kaminski, H)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/9/16 ORDERING that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including 9/1/16, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant may have an extension of time to 10/3/16 to file her opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due 10/24/16. (Becknal, R)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/12/16: Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including August 2, 2016, in which to file Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant may have an extension of time to September 1, 2016 to file her opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due September 22, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/24/2016 ORDERING that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including 6/29/2016, in which to file a Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant may have an extension of time to 7/29/2016 to file her opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due 8/19/2016. (Zignago, K.)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/04/16 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl E. Christensen
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?