Singh et al v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: |
Raj Singh and Karen Singh |
Defendant: |
Wells Fargo Bank |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv02664 |
Filed: |
December 23, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
29
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/17/17 RECOMMENDING that: Defendant's 18 motion to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim be GRANTED; The complaint be DISMISSED without leave to amend; The Clerk be directed to CLOSE the case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
|
August 1, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/01/16 ordering the 08/03/16 show cause hearing is continued to 9/07/16. ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan regardi ng the purported service of process performed by Jason Smith.) In addition to whatever other testimony or evidence plaintiff's wish to present, they shall subpoena or otherwise produce Jason Smith for testimony at the 9/07/16 evidentiary hearing. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order and ECF 12 on Welss Fargo Bank's agent for service of process at the following address: Corporation Service Company, 2710 Gateway Oaks Dr, Ste 150N, Sacramento, CA 95833.. (Plummer, M)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/1/2016 ORDERING the Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE on 8/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan why this action should not be dismissed for failure to effect service of process. (Donati, J)
|
May 19, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/18/16 ORDERING that that plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 14 days why this action should not be dismissed for failure to effect service of process; the Initial Scheduling Confer ence is RESET to 8/31/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan; not later than 14 days before the Initial Scheduling Conference, the parties shall file status reports in accordance with the Court's 3 12/23/15 order.(Benson, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?