Miller v. Stone
Plaintiff: |
Gil A. Miller |
Defendant: |
John Stone |
Movant: |
Baker Recovery Services |
Case Number: |
2:2015mc00137 |
Filed: |
November 4, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Presiding Judge: |
William B. Shubb |
Nature of Suit: |
Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause of Action: |
Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 16, 2016 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/16/2016 IMMEDIATELY RECALLING all Writs of Execution, all Notices of Levies, and all Notices of Judgment Lien issued in this matter; ORDERING all banks, including J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and B ank of America to release any holds on the funds of John Stone pursuant to Notices of Levy Under Writ of Execution issued in this matter; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal's Office to recall or cancel any pending levies and to release to John Stone any funds it is holding pursuant to the Writs of Execution issued in this matter. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
|
May 26, 2016 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/26/2016 ORDERING that plaintiff shall file its response to defendant's 29 Ex Parte Application no later than one week from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/2016 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall: Return defendant's check to him; and Close the case. CASE CLOSE (Reader, L) Modified on 5/13/2016 (Reader, L).
|
May 2, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/30/16 ORDERING that, based on the 24 Notice of Withdrawal, the 05/04/16 judgment debtor examination is VACATED; defendant's 15 Motion To Stay (ECF No. 15), is DENIED as moot; and the par ties are Ordered To SHOW CAUSE, in writing, by 05/11/6 why defendant's tendered check should not be returned to plaintiff, and why this case should not be closed. If the parties wish to have defendants check deposited into the courts registry, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 and Local Rule 150. (Benson, A)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/5/16 ORDERING that the submitted "Substitution of Attorneys" 18 is NOT APPROVED; Plaintiff shall serve and file a response to the Motion To Stay (ECF No. 15 ), no later than 4/19/2016 at 4:30 p.m., at which time the motion will be taken under submission. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
7
ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/3/15: Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Kaminski, H)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?