Beals v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Beals
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/29/2017 ORDERING that EAJA fees are awarded to plaintiff in the amount of Six Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($6,500.00). (Zignago, K.)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/13/17, GRANTING Plaintiffs 17 motion for summary judgment. Defendant's 20 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk shall enter judgment for plaintiff. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/16 ORDERING the defendant's responses to 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 11/16/2016. All other deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order remain the same. (Washington, S)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/18/16 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiff to file his MOTION for Summary Judgment in this action is EXTENDED through 9/1/16. No additional extensions of time will be gran ted to Plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED through 10/17/16. All other aspects of the Scheduling Order previously issued in this action remain unchanged. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/21/16 ORDERING that the time for Plaintiff to file his Motion for Summary Judgment/Remand is extended 30 days until 8/18/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/17/16 ORDERING that the 7 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Benson, A)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/10/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall within 14 days from the date of this order show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beals v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Beals
Represented By: Jared Thomas Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?