Anderson v. California Medical Facility - Solano
Plaintiff: Julius Anderson
Defendant: California Medical Facility - Solano
Case Number: 2:2016cv00018
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/17/19 ORDERING within 14 days from the date of this order, defendants shall advise whether settlement proceeds have been paid and, if so, to whom the proceeds were paid and on what date, and, i f not, the current status of such settlement package. If settlement proceeds have been paid to plaintiffs counsel, within 14 days from the date of this order, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court, in writing, as to the status of such settleme nt proceeds; and the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order on plaintiffs attorney of record, John Stringer, as well as on plaintiff Julius Anderson, K-33896, California Medical Facility, P.O. Box 2500, Vacaville, CA 95696-2500.(Plummer, M)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/19/19 DISCHARGING 71 the order to show cause. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/27/19 ORDERING within fourteen days from the date of this order, plaintiffs counsel shall show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for the delay in processing the documents required to complete the settlement of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order on plaintiffs attorney of record, John Stringer, as well as on plaintiff Julius Anderson, K-33896, California Medical Facility, P.O. Box 2500, Vacaville, CA 95696-2500.(Plummer, M)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/30/19 ORDERING within 21 days from the date of this order, counsel for defendants shall file a status report as to the payment of settlement proceeds in this action. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on plaintiff's attorney of record, John Stringer, as well as on plaintiff Julius Anderson, K-33896, California Medical Facility, PO Box 2500, Vacaville, CA 95696-2500. (Plummer, M)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/2018 ORDERING a stipulation for voluntary dismissal with prejudice was filed on 4/30/2018 and this case was closed. Plaintiff is advised that no orders will issue in response to future filings. (Copy of this order served on plaintiff's attorney of record, John Stringer, and plaintiff Julius Anderson, K-33896, California Medical Facility, P.O. Box 2500, Vacaville, CA 95696-2500) (Henshaw, R)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/5/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Julius Anderson #K-33896, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 3/15/2018 in courtroom #25, before Magi strate Judge Kendall J. Newman; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: KJN, OTCD-SAC)(Yin, K)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/5/2017 DENYING plaintiff's motion for leave to amend (ECF No. 42 at 4-7). (Yin, K)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/03/17 DISMISSING all defendants other than defendants Hernandez and Mendoza and all claims other than those arising under the First and Eighth Amendments described in the magistrate judge's findings and recommendations. (Benson, A.)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/03/17. (Plummer, M)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/20/2017 ORDERING 34 "Third Amended Complaint" is stricken; DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit completed Notice of Submission of Documents with service documents within 30 days from the date of this order. Service is appropriate for G. Hernandez and Mendoza. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 2 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the 37 Third Amended Complaint filed on 1/1 7/2017. Also, RECOMMENDING that all defendants other than defendants Hernandez and Mendoza and all claims other than those arising under the 1st and 8th Amendments described in this Order be dismissed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/28/2016 VACATING the court's 10/4/2016 findings and recommendations 31 ; plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED; the supplemental complaint filed on 9/30/2016 is STRICKEN; and plaintiff has 30 days to file a third amended complaint. (Yin, K)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/4/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 29 motion for leave to file a third amended complaint; and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/21/16 DENYING without prejudice 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/15/16. (Plummer, M)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/10/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel (ECF No. 16 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs May 6, 2016 supplemental pleading (ECF No. 15 ) is STRICKEN. Plaintiff is granted 30 days within which to file a motion seeking leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff must provide a copy of the proposed amended complaint with his motion.(Dillon, M)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/14/16 ORDERING that all defendants OTHER THAN Mendoza and Hernandez are DISMISSED. (Benson, A)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Julius Anderson signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/30/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward t o the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/02/16 denying Motion to Appoint Counsel 4 , 5 . Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. California Medical Facility - Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Facility - Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?