Lena v. Foulk et al
Plaintiff: Michael Angelo Lena
Defendant: Frank Foulk, High Desert State Prison's Committee Chairpersons, High Desert State Prison's Commitee for Inmate Classifications, R. Williams, B. Cook, J. Frye, R. LaValleur, L. Parks, D. Clark and McConnell
Case Number: 2:2016cv00152
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/12/2018 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/30/2017 ORDERING that The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTERD to serve a copy of 32 Response on Senior Attorney General Monica Anderson. An informal response to the contentions in plaintiffs 10/18/2017 response within 21 days from the date of this order. (Hunt, G)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/2017 DENYING 30 Motion for Extension of Time. (Hunt, G)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/17, GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 27 motion for reconsideration. Upon reconsideration, the court's 9/28/2016 order dismissing plaintiff's complaint with leave to amend is confirmed. Plaintiff is GRANTED one final period of 30 days in which to file an amended complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/28/16 NOT ADOPTING 13 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of this order. This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings. (Washington, S)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/19/16 ordering on 5/13/16 plaintiff filed a document in which he requested the undersigned recuse. Plaintiff's request is denied. (Plummer, M)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/16 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Michael Angelo Lena signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/9/2016. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwar d to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/1/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lena v. Foulk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Angelo Lena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison's Committee Chairpersons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison's Commitee for Inmate Classifications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. LaValleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?