Salehi et al v. Rite Aid Corporation
Plaintiff: Elaheh Salehi, Shannon Betts and Belinda Paine
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00174
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/2/2018 ORDERING, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/5/2018 APPROVING 33 Stipulation, EXTENDING Dispositive motion deadline to 3/15/2018, and CONTINUING Hearing on such motion to 4/24/2018, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. (York, M)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/12/17 ORDERING that the deadlines are EXTENDED as follows: The close of Discovery is EXTENDED from 9/29/17, to 12/29/2017; The Dispositive Motion deadline is EXTENDED from 12/8/17, to 3/8/2018. The dispositive Motion hearing date is CONTINUED from 1/9/18, to 4/9/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/25/2017 FINDING that this action is related to the action denominated 2:17-cv-01527 MCE CKD within the meaning of Local Rule 123; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. (Michel, G.)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/14/2017 ORDERING that discovery be completed by 9/29/2017; ORDERING that dispositive motions be filed by 12/8/2017 and noticed for hearing on 1/9/2018. (Michel, G.)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/21/17 ORDERING that the deadlines in the following cases are extended as follows: the close of Discovery is EXTENDED from 4/28/17, to 7/28/17; the Dispositive Motion deadline is EXT ENDED from 7/11/17, to 10/10/17; and the Dispositive Motion Hearing date is CONTINUED from 8/8/17, to 11/7/17 at 1:30 p.m. This order applies only to the following related cases: 2:13-CV-02439 JAM-EFB; 2:14-CV-01946 JAM-EFB; 2:14-CV-01960 JAM -EFB; 2:15-CV-00623 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02150 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02396 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01748 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02597 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01872 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01874 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02594 JAM-EFB; 2:16-CV-00174 JAM-EFB; 2:16-CV-00211 JAM-EFB; and 2:16-CV-01028 JAM-EFB. (Becknal, R)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/13/16. (Benson, A)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/24/2016 DISMISSING Belinda Paine's claims with prejudice. (Donati, J)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/2016 ORDERING that Rite Aid Corporation's objections to the Court's 6/9/2016 Status Order (Doc #47-Case #14-cv-1961) are OVERRULED. (Zignago, K.)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/18/16 ORDERING that this action is related to case 2:16-CV-01028 JAM-EFB.(Becknal, R)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/4/16 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The parties shall file a single joint status report no later than 5/18/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 02/05/16 ORDERING that this matter RELATED to the following cases: 2:14-cv-01961, 2:14-cv-01960, 2:14-cv-01957, 2:14-cv-01946, 2:14-cv-01965, No. 2:13-CV-02439, No. 2:14-cv-01963, No. 2:15 -CV-00429, No. 2:15-CV-00623, No. 2:15-CV-00622, 2:15-CV-02150, No. 1:15-cv-01721, No. 2:15-cv-02396, 1:1 5-cv-01748, 2:15-cv-02597, 1:15-cv-01872, 1:15-cv-01874, 2:15-cv-02594. This matter is reassinged to Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings and the new case number is 2:16-cv-0174 JAM EFB. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salehi et al v. Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaheh Salehi
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Betts
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Paine
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Gina Guarienti Cook
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?