Allen v. Superior Court of California County of Sacramento et al.
Plaintiff: Craig D. Allen
Defendant: Superior Court of California County of Sacramento and Sacramento County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 2:2016cv00214
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/15/2018 ORDERING this action is DISMISSED pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/9/17. This case is SET for a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/17/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/12/2017 ORDERING 24 Plaintiff's Motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. (Reader, L)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/20/17. (Kaminski, H)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/8/2017 RECOMMENDING that the 31 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that should these Findings and Recommendation b e adopted by the District Judge: The parties are directed to engage immediately in the exchange of information required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) if they have not already done so. The parties are directed to complete their init ial discovery conference and development of a discovery plan within 60 days of the date of that Order of adoption, if adopted, and to report its completion to the court. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/19/2017 DISMISSING the 10 Third Amended Complaint against CG Services. (Michel, G.)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/19/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a second amended complaint within 28 days from the date of service of this Order. (Kastilahn, A)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/5/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 4/4/16 MOTION for an Extension of time 5 is GRANTED; Plaintiff is GRANTED until 5/12/2016 in which to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's Request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 4 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/11/16 ORDERING the Plaintiff shall submit, within 28 days from the date of this order, either a completed and signed application and affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma p auperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. The complaint is dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file an amended complaint within 28 days from the date of service of this Order. The amended complaint must comply with the requirements of the FRCP, and the Local Rules of Practice; the amended complaint must bear the docket num ber assigned this case and must be labeled Amended Complaint; failure to file an amended complaint will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Superior Court of California County of Sacramento et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?