Bobadilla v. Lizarraga et al.
Plaintiff: Anthony Bobadilla
Defendant: J. Lizarraga, G. Murphy, B. Cochran, G. Guzman, Wendy Worrell, W. David Smiley, D. Coffin and M. Montez
Case Number: 2:2016cv00226
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/05/17 DENYING the 22 Motion for Reconsideration; the 21 09/06/17 Order of the magistrate judge is AFFIRMED. (Benson, A.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/05/17 DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/21/2017 GRANTING 18 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to file his objections. (Henshaw, R)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/26/2017 RECOMMENDING the 12 amended complaint be dismissed without further leave to amend, the 13 , 14 motions for injunctive relief be denied, and the Clerk be directed to close the case. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/7/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 4 ) is GRANTED. The complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff's request for service of the complaint (ECF No. 7 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint (ECF No. 8 ) is DENIED as moot.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobadilla v. Lizarraga et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bobadilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lizarraga
Represented By: Andrea R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Guzman
Represented By: Andrea R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Worrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. David Smiley
Represented By: Andrea R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Coffin
Represented By: Andrea R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Montez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?