Vivian v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Glen Earl Vivian
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00227
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/20/2017 GRANTING 25 Motion to Proceed IFP. (cc USCA)(Donati, J)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/17/2017 DENYING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. GRANTING 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED, and judgment is entered for the Commissioner. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/26/2016 ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to file a Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the 15 Motion for Summary Judgment by 12/26/2016; ADJUSTING all other case deadlines accordingly. (Michel, G.)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is DENIED. Within 28 days of this order, Plaintiff shall pay the applicable filing fee. However, the court will ente rtain a request for a reasonable extension of time to pay the fee should such an extension be necessary. Failure to timely pay the filing fee, or timely request an extension of time to do so, may result in dismissal of the action pursuant to FRCP 41(b). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivian v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Earl Vivian
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?