Phan v. Employment Development Department
Plaintiff: Loan Phan
Defendant: Employment Development Department
Case Number: 2:2016cv00256
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/17. (Kaminski, H)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/6/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Third Amended Complaint by 2/1/2017. (Michel, G.)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/22/16 ORDERING that this matter is referred back to the District Judge assigned to this action. All dates pending before the undersigned are vacated. Henceforth the caption on documents filed in this action shall be No. 2:16-cv-256 KJM CKD. (Kastilahn, A)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/16/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall, no later than 9/28/2016, file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss. Defendant shall file its reply, if any, no later than 10/5/2016. The hearing on the motion is CONTINUED to 10/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Plaintiff's 9 Petition is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 9/16/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/15/16: HEARING as to 6 MOTION to DISMISS reset for 9/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan v. Employment Development Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loan Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employment Development Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?