Lennar Mare Island, LLC v. Steadfast Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lennar Mare Island, LLC
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00291
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/21/2017 ORDERING that the stay for this consolidated case, and all discovery, proceedings, and deadlines, is EXTENDED for a period of 60 days. The Status Conference is CONTINUED to 10/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller to brief the Court on the finalization of the settlement; provided, however, that if the parties finalize the settlement and file appropriate dismissal papers in this Court prior to the Status Conference, the Status Conference may be removed from the calendar. The trial date of 12/18/2017 shall be continued approximately 60 days to a date convenient to the Court on a date to be addressed and confirmed at the Status Conference. (Washington, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2017 ORDERING that this consolidated case is STAYED for a period of 60 days. The Court sets a mandatory Status Conference for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. In the event the parties are unable to finalize the settlement, the parties shall be prepared to address at the Status Conference any necessary adjustments to the trial date and all other deadlines in the 6/28/16 Order. The trial date of 10/16/2017 is CONTINUED to 12/18/2017 at 9:00 AM, with this date to be addressed and confirmed at the Status Conference as necessary. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2017 ORDERING that the deposition of Expert Jeffrey Zelikson may proceed in San Francisco, California, during the week of 8/7/2017, on a date to be mutually agreed upon by the parties, and FURTHER ORDERS that the deposition Valerie Lee will occur on 6/23/2017, in San Francisco, California. All other deadlines, including the 10/16/2017 trial date, are unchanged. (Zignago, K.)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/14/2017 ORDERING Designation of Expert Witnesses EXTENDED to 5/3/2017; Supplemental expert disclosure deadline EXTENDED to 5/12/2017; Completion of all expert discovery EXTENDED to 6/12/2017; All other dates contained in the pretrial order, including the trial date, shall remain in place. (Washington, S)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/12/2017 ALLOWING Plaintiff Lennar Mare Island, LLC to take the deposition of John Mahoney, currently set for 4/12/2017 at 09:00 AM; LIMITING the plaintiff to a total of three (3) consecutive hours in which to take said deposition; PROHIBITING the plaintiff from taking the deposition of Steve Hatch. (Michel, G.)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/7/17 ORDERING the parties have scheduled an informal discovery dispute call on Monday April 10, 2017, at 3:00 P.M., to discuss issues regarding the depositions of certain Steadfast witnesses. The parties' two page joint submission is due to the court by no later than 2:00 PM on Friday April 7, 2017. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, the court hereby extends the submission deadline until 12:00 PM on Monday April 10, 2017. (Becknal, R)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/3/17. The Court hereby grants the request of LENNAR MARE ISLAND, LLC, that its counsel be allowed to appear telephonically at the hearing scheduled for 4/6/17, at 10:00 a.m (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/3/2017 GRANTING 132 Request filed by United States to Appear Telephonically at the 4/6/2017 Hearing. (Donati, J)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/17 ORDERING that the discovery completion deadline in both actions is extended to 4/14/17, for the sole purpose of tentatively scheduling the depositions of Steve Hatch and John Mahoney. Th e current 4/7/17 discovery completion deadline remains in place in both actions for all other non-expert discovery, including the depositions of any other individuals. All other deadlines set forth in the operative pretrial scheduling order filed in both actions on 6/28/16, remain in effect; This order resolves the motion for a protective order filed at ECF No. 471 in Case No. 12-cv-2182, and ECF No. 102 in Case No. 2:16-cv-0291.
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/17 GRANTING the request of Plaintiff-Intervenor the United States of America to appear telephonically at the hearing scheduled for March 23, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. (Becknal, R)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/17/2017 GRANTING 73 , 75 Motions to Compel; ORDERING Steadfast Insurance Company to produce to Lennar Mare Island, LLC by 04:00 PM on 3/3/2017, a declaration representing upon Steadfast' s information and belief that it has produced every document that, as of that date, comprises the claims files Lennar seeks through its request for inspection numbers 37 and 124 and identifying, for each such claim file described in Lennar's requests, the produced documents that make up each such file by their Bates stamp numbers; GRANTING Lennar Mare Island, LLC's Request for attorneys' fees for the amount of $10,800.00. (Michel, G.)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/25/2017 ORDERING that by no later than 1/26/2017 at 5:00 p.m., LMI shall file a brief statement regarding whether it opposes Steadfasts request to continue the 2/2/2017 hearing to 2/16/2017, and , if so, its reasons why Steadfasts request should be denied. If LMI does not oppose a continuance, but has a scheduling conflict with the courts proposed 2/16/2017 hearing date, it shall state as much and provide alternative dates for the continued hearing. If the court does not receive a response from LMI by the above deadline, it will continue the hearing date to 2/16/2017. (Donati, J.)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION and ORDER re CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/18/17. (Benson, A)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/22/2016. (Michel, G.)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/4/16 ORDERING that Steadfast's motions to quash 2:12-cv-2182 393 ; 2:16-cv-0291 39 are DENIED. Accordingly, the third party reinsurers shall produce documents responsive to the request s set forth in Lennar's subpoenas within a reasonable timeframe. If a reinsurer subject to one of the subpoenas has any objections to the subpoena requests directed towards it, that reinsurer may file a properly noticed motion to quash or mod ify the subpoena on its own behalf. Any such motions should be filed as soon as reasonably possible; The court's April 7, 2015 order in 2:12-cv-2182 that the parties be required to meet in person to meet and confer re any discovery disputes in that action prior to filing a discovery motion 263 is VACATED. The parties may satisfy the meet and confer requirement telephonically or through other remote means prior to filing future discovery motions provided that such communications are not treated as a perfunctory exercise; This order resolves the motions to quash filed at ECF No. 393 in 2:12-cv-2182, and 39 in 2:16-cv-0291. (Becknal, R)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/2/2016 ORDERING the Court GRANTS 47 the request by United States of America to appear telephonically at the motion to quash hearing scheduled for 11/3/2016, at 10:00 AM. 39 (Reader, L)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/05/16 ORDERING that the U.S.'s 32 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED and limits the U.S.'s intervention to breach of contract and declaratory judgment claims arising out of the ELI insurance policy, under which the U.S. is an additional insured. The U.S. is ORDERED to file a separate complaint in intervention within 14 days. All initial disclosures related to the U.S.'s claims must be made within 30 days. (Benson, A)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/08/16 ORDERING that this order shall be filed in both 2:16-cv-0291 KJM KJN and 2:12-cv-2182 KJM KJN; Steadfast's 11 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; the 06/23/16 Initial Scheduling Confere nce is VACATED and is RESET for 6/17/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller to coincide with the hearing on the 14 Motion to Consolidate; by 06/13/16, the parties in Case No. 2:16-cv-0291 shall file a joi nt status report; in addition, by the same date, the parties in both cases shall file a joint report and address their respective positions on whether the scheduling order in Case No. 2:12-cv-2182 should be modified to allow the filing of an amended or supplemental complaint; the U.S. Navy's request to appear at the reset 06/17/16 status conference is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/26/16. (Kaminski, H)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/22/16: This action is related with member case 2:12-cv-02182-KJM-KJN and reassigned from Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:16-cv- 00291-KJM-KJN.(Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lennar Mare Island, LLC v. Steadfast Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennar Mare Island, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Lee Dillion
Represented By: Alan H. Packer
Represented By: Ryan L. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: John Sherman Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?