Lane v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Veronika A. Lane
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00301
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/11/17: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 14 is denied. Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment 17 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. (Kaminski, H)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/27/2016 ORDERING that the time for responding to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 11/07/2016. (Butolph, J)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/30/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall have a second extension of time of (7) days up through and including 9/6/2016 in which to e-file her Motion for Summary Judgment; and Defendant shall file any opposition, including cross-motions, on or before 10/6/2016. (Zignago, K.)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/5/2016 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 8/29/2016; ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to file a Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by 9/28/2016. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronika A. Lane
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?