Contreras et al v. Nationstar, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eugenio Contreras, Rosa Contreras, William Phillips, Melva Phillips, Teresa Barney, Keith Marcel, Teresa Marcel, Sherlie Charlot, Colleen Ann O'Halloran, Jennie Miller and Edward Yager
Defendant: Nationstar, LLC and Solutionstar, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00302
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/13/2020 EXTENDING DEADLINES as follow: Class Certification Amended Expert Report Deadline (for Plaintiffs) 02/03/2021; Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion for Class Cer tification 2/24/2021; Class Certification Amended Expert Report Deadline (for Defendants) 03/24/2021; Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 04/21/2021; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification 06/02/2021; Class-Certification Expert Discovery Cutoff 06/16/2021; Merits discovery cutoff 09/03/2021; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses 10/28/2021. Rebuttal Expert Reports 12/03/2021; Expert Discovery Cutoff 01/07/2022. Deadline for Parties to File Dispositive Motions 02/04/2022. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/16/2020 EXTENDING Schedule deadlines as follows: Class Certification Amended Expert Report Deadline (for Plaintiffs) 10/21/2020. Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion for C lass Certification 11/11/2020. Class Certification Amended Expert Report Deadline (for Defendants) 12/9/2020. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 1/6/2021. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification 2/17/2021. Class-Certification Expert Discovery Cutoff 3/3/2021. Merits discovery cutoff 5/21/2021. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Information 7/15/2021. Rebuttal Expert Reports 8/20/2021. Expert Discovery Cutoff due by 9/24/2020. Deadline to file Dispositive Motions 10/22/2021.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/4/2020 ORDERING that Plaintiffs shall file the third amended class action complaint within seven days. Defendants answer shall be filed fourteen (14) days after service of the TAC. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/1/2020 EXTENDING deadlines as follows: Motion for Class Certification due 8/4/2020; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/15/2021; Discovery due by 3/22/2021; Dispositive Motions filed by 7/23/2021. (Zignago, K.)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/6/20 EXTENDING Discovery deadlines. Merits discovery cutoff EXTENDED to 1/20/2021. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Information Required by Rule 26(a)(2) EXTENDED to 2/15/2021. Deadline for Parties to File Dispositive Motions EXTENDED to 5/24/2021. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 AMENDED STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER for the treatment of confidential information signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/1/19. (Kastilahn, A)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/22/19 EXTENDING Discovery Deadline as follows: Class Certification Amended Expert Report Deadline (for Plaintiffs) 1/14/20; Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion for Cl ass Certification 2/4/20; Class Certification Amended Expert Report Deadline (for Defendants) 3/2/20; Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 3/23/20; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Cer tification 5/4/20; Class-Certification Expert Discovery Cutoff 5/18/20; Merits discovery cutoff 7/20/2020; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Information Required by Rule 26(a)(2) 8/14/2020; Rebuttal Expert Reports 9/22/20; Expert Discovery Cutoff 10/26/20; Deadline for Parties to File Dispositive Motions 11/24/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/1/2019 ORDERING plaintiffs' 95 request to file documents under seal is GRANTED IN PART. Defendants' 93 request to file documents under seal is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 89 motion to compel defendants to produce documents without redactions is GRANTED. Defendants' 90 motion for a protective order is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/8/19 EXTENDING the case deadlines as follows: Answer to Second Amended Complaint due by 4/15/19. Class Certification Amended Expert Report due by 8/15/19. Class-Certificat ion Expert Discovery Cutoff is 9/13/19. Motion for Class Certification due by 10/4/19. Opposition to Plaintiffs Motionfor Class Certification due by 11/15/19. Reply in Support of Motion for ClassCertification due by 12/13/19. Merits discovery cutoff is 3/20/20. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 4/17/20. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 5/22/20. Expert Discovery Cutoff is 6/26/20. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/24/20. (Coll, A)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/20/19. Defendants will file a response to the operative Second Amended Complaint no later than 4/1/2019. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/14/19 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 53 Motion to Dismiss consistent with this order and GRANTING plaintiff 20 days to file an Amended Complaint. (Coll, A)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/2/2019 ORDERING the following deadlines EXTENDED: Class-Certification Expert Discovery cutoff EXTENDED to 4/11/2019; Plaintiffs' deadline to file Motion for Class Certif ication EXTENDED to 4/25/2019; Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification EXTENDED to 05/22/2019; Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification EXTENDED to 06/07/2019; Merits discovery cutoff EXTENDED to 9/13/2019; Disclosure of Expert witnesses and information EXTENDED to 10/11/2019; Rebuttal Expert Reports EXTENDED to 11/15/2019; Expert Discovery Cutoff EXTENDED to 12/27/2019; Deadline for Parties to file Dispositive Motions EXTENDED to 1/24/2020. (Washington, S)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/21/18 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 55 Motion to Compel as detailed in the Order. (Benson, A.)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/17/18 GRANTING 31 Motion to Amend the Complaint; plaintiffs are directed to file their Second Amended Complaint within 5 days. Defendants' pending 28 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. (Benson, A.)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/14/18. (Benson, A.)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/9/18 governing the production of hard copy documents and electronically stored information. (Kaminski, H)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/13/2017 ORDERING Defendant Solutionstar, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the 22 First Amended Complaint by 10/31/2017. (Michel, G.)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/5/2017 ORDERING: Within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order the parties shall meet and confer regarding their discovery plan. All discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, s hall be completed no later than three hundred sixty-five (365) days from the date of this Order. All counsel are to designate in writing and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert that they propose to ten der at trial not later than sixty (60) days after the close of discovery. Supplemental List due within thirty (30) days after the designation of expert witnesses. The parties shall file dispositive motions no later than one hundred eighty (180) days after the close of non-expert discovery. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after receiving this Courts ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). If the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after the close of the designation of supplemental expert witnesses. This Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order will become final without further order of the Court unless objections are filed within sixty (60) days of service on all defendant(s). (Washington, S)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/9/17, ORDERING that Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (See order for further details.) (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/10/2017 (Kastilahn, A).
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/5/16: Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss no later than June 16, 2016 and Defendants will file their reply to plaintiffs' opposition no later than July 7, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras et al v. Nationstar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Contreras
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser, PHV
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Contreras
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser, PHV
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Phillips
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melva Phillips
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Barney
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser, PHV
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Marcel
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser, PHV
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Marcel
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser, PHV
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlie Charlot
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser, PHV
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Ann O'Halloran
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Miller
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser, PHV
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Yager
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutionstar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?