Olic v. Booth
Plaintiff: |
Milorad Olic |
Defendant: |
J. Booth and E. Palubicki |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00307 |
Filed: |
February 16, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
San Luis Obispo |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 26, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/2017 ORDERING the custodian to produce Milorad Olic AI-0259, to testify in USDC at 10:00 a. m. on 3/16/2017 in courtroom #8, before Magistra te Judge Edmund F. Brennan; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: EFB; OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
|
November 28, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 90 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/28/16. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy, Matt Caspar, within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the partie s shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Stay is GRANTED; is action is stayed for 120 days to allow the parties an opportunity to settle their dispute before a responsive pleading is filed, or the discovery process begins. (cc: Monica Anderson)(Dillon, M)
|
May 4, 2016 |
Filing
12
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/16 RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing
10
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/23/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Milorad Olic and forward payment to the court until the balance i s paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/25/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?