Wilkins v. Gonzalez, et al.
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins
Defendant: Paul Gonzalez, S. Pulley, Jeff Macomber, J. Tabayoyong, Timothy M. Lockwood, M. Fregoso, B. Burkhart, M. Voong, C. Burnett, S. K. Hemenway, Jean Weiss and Couch
Case Number: 2:2016cv00347
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/4/2018 due to the deadline lapsing for payment for the filing fee the court is DISMISSING this action in full. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CLOSED (Washington, S)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/13/2018 DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 62 request to stay or extension of time to pay his filing fee. To the extent plaintiff's filing may be construed as a motion for reconsid eration of the court's 61 order revoking his IFP status, the motion is DENIED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the $400.00 filing fee by 4/2/2018. Absent good cause, the court will not grant another extension. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action. (York, M)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/31/2018 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 59 are ADOPTED to the extent consistent with this order; Defendants' 50 Motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is revoked and plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order in which to pay the filing fee of $400.00 for this action. (Reader, L)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/23/2017 RECOMMENDING defendants' 50 motion to revoke plaintiffs in forma pauperis status be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/30/17 ordering defendants motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading 51 is granted; if defendants motion to revoke plaintiffs in forma pauperis status is denied, defendants shall file their responsive pleading within thirty days of the courts final order denying that motion. Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time 55 is granted; plaintiffs opposition to defendants motion to revoke his in forma pauperis status is due within thirty days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/9/2017 CONFIRMING 33 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations. This Order resolves 37 Motion for Reconsideration. (Donati, J)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/03/17 ORDERING that the 37 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/12/17 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff 2 USM-285 forms. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the 2 completed USM-285 forms required to effect service on defendants Swarthout and Chaiken. (Plummer, M)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/18/17 recommending that plaintiff's motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal 35 be denied. MOTION 35 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER adopting 20 , 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/17: All claims in the second amended complaint, except for the retaliation claims against defendants Swarthout, Chaiken, Jones, Vasquez, Hurtz, Couch, Gonzales and Pulley, and the Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Jones, are dismissed. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a third amended complaint 23 is denied. (Kaminski, H)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/09/16 recommending that plaintiff's motion for leave to file a third amended complaint 23 be denied. MOTION 23 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/26/16 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for leave to file a third amended complaint (ECF No. 23 ) be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/12/16 RECOMMENDING that all claims in the second amended complaint, except for the retaliation claims against defendants Swarthout, Chaiken, Jones, Vasquez, Hurtz, Couch, Gonzales and Pulley, and the Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Jones, be dismissed. referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/02/16 vacating 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff is granted thirty days to file a second amended complaint raising a retaliation claim.Plaintiffs motion to present additional evidence 14 is denied. (Plummer, M)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/4/2016 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/17/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Keenan Wilkins and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Gonzalez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Tabayoyong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Fregoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. K. Hemenway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?