JL Audio, Inc. v. Saif et al
Plaintiff: JL Audio, Inc.
Defendant: Dia Saif and Arden Audio
Case Number: 2:2016cv00377
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss 22 signed by District Judge John A. Mendez for Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/11/2017. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/30/2017 GRANTING 7 Motion to Strike. Defendants may file an amended answer within 30 days from the date of this order. (Hunt, G)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/5/2017 ORDERING 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer to Complaint; Hearing Reset for 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; All parties shall appear by counsel or in person if acting without counsel; Status reports are not necessary at this time. (Reader, L)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/21/16 ORDERING that pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21), this case is hereby referred to the assigned magistrate judge, Allison Claire, for all further proceedings consistent with the provisions of the rule. All dates now pending before Senior Judge William B. Shubb are hereby vacated and the 6/27/2016 motion hearing is taken off calendar. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JL Audio, Inc. v. Saif et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL Audio, Inc.
Represented By: Raffi Vaheh Zerounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dia Saif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arden Audio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?