Mosley v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Carlton V. Mosley
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard, Jeff Macomber and Sampley
Case Number: 2:2016cv00420
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/30/19 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute.. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/13/19 ORDERING plaintiff's first amended complaint 19 is dismissed with leave to amend. Within 30 days from the date of service of this order, plaintiff may file an amended complaint. The clerk of court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district. (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/9/2017 DISMISSING 1 Complaint with Leave to Amend. Amended Complaint due within 30 days from the date of service of the Order. (York, M)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 16 Motion for leave to present a late claim signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/10/16. (Plummer, M)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/22/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Carlton V. Mosley and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton V. Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sampley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?