Hicks v. Lizarrage et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael J. Hicks |
Defendant: |
J. Lizarrage, G. Stratton, D. Paramo, B. Muniz and V. Comeli |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00453 |
Filed: |
March 3, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 1, 2018 |
Filing
18
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/1/2018 VACATING 11 Findings and Recommendations and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A for failure to state a claim. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
May 17, 2017 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/17/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to comply with the 8 Screening Order within 30 days; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to timely comply with this order will result in the submission of the 11 Findings and Recommendations to the district judge for consideration; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to re-serve the plaintiff with a copy of the 8 Screening Order. (Michel, G.)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing
11
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/3/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/23/17 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Michael Hicks and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial) (Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?