Universal North America Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Universal North America Insurance Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00487
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/18 ORDERING that this matter having now been resolved in its entirety, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. (Kaminski, H)
November 7, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice by Universal North America Insurance Company. (Alper, Dean)
November 7, 2018 Filing 26 [DISREGARD - SEE #27 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER] PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice by Universal North America Insurance Company. (Alper, Dean) Modified on 11/8/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
November 7, 2018 Filing 25 [DISREGARD - SEE #27 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER] STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of Entire Action with Prejudice by Universal North America Insurance Company. (Alper, Dean) Modified on 11/8/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
November 6, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by relief courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: A review of the docket shows counsel failed to comply with the Court's September 8, 2017 Minute Order requiring dispositional documents be filed on or before November 7, 2017. Not later than ten (10) days following the date of this minute order, Counsel are ordered to show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute or to comply with the rules or orders of this Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Fabillaran, J)
September 8, 2017 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to the representations of the attorney for Defendant, the Court determined this case is settled. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents are to be filed on or before November 7, 2017. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. Accordingly, all due dates and hearings set forth in this matter are VACATED. (Deutsch, S)
September 5, 2017 Filing 22 JOINT NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (Gaus, Edward) Modified on 9/6/2017 (Kaminski, H).
August 31, 2017 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after receiving this Court's ruling on the last filed dispositive motion. If the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after the close of discovery and the notice must include statements of intent to forgo the filing of dispositive motions. The parties are to set forth in their Notice of Trial Readiness, the appropriateness of special procedures, whether this case is related to any other case(s) on file in the Eastern District of California, the prospect for settlement, their estimated trial length, any request for a jury, and their availability for trial. After review of the parties' Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the Court will issue an order that sets forth new dates for a final pretrial conference and trial. (Deutsch, S)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/12/17 ORDERING that the Designation of Expert Witnesses is due by 6/20/2017, Expert Rebuttal Disclosures due by 7/13/2017, and Dispositive Motions to be by 10/20/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
May 11, 2017 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER re #17 Ex Parte Application by Universal North America Insurance Company. (Alper, Dean)
May 11, 2017 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the EX PARTE APPLICATION by Universal North America Insurance Company for Extension of Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines; Proposed Order (ECF No. 17). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
May 11, 2017 Filing 17 EX PARTE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Universal North America Insurance Company for Extension of Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. (Alper, Dean)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/6/2017 ORDERING Attorney Scott A. Richman, to appear for Ford Motor Company. (Reader, L)
March 30, 2017 Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Ford Motor Company for attorney Scott A. Richman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-6988843) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gaus, Edward)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/16/17. Added Attorney Linnea M. Eberhart, PHV for Ford Motor Company. (Becknal, R)
March 13, 2017 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Ford Motor Company for attorney Linnea M. Eberhart to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-6958508) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gaus, Edward)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/22/17: The discovery deadline in this case, currently set for March 8, 2017, is hereby extended for 30 days to April 7, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
February 15, 2017 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Ford Motor Company. (Gaus, Edward)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED SHARING and NON-SHARING PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/5/2017. (Donati, J)
December 29, 2016 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Gaus, Edward)
June 22, 2016 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Dillon, M)
May 13, 2016 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ford Motor Company and Universal North America Insurance Company. (Gaus, Edward) Modified on 5/16/2016 (Washington, S).
May 4, 2016 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Gaus, Edward B added.(Gaus, Edward)
March 29, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ford Motor Company served on 3/14/2016, answer due 4/4/2016. (Alper, Dean)
March 9, 2016 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 9, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ford Motor Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dean A. Alper* *Alper & Mcculloch* *100 Drakes Landing Road, Suite 160* *Greenbrae, CA 94904*. (Kaminski, H)
March 8, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Universal North America Insurance Company (Alper, Dean)
March 8, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Universal North America Insurance Company. Attorney Alper, Dean A. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6356852) (Alper, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal North America Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal North America Insurance Company
Represented By: Dean A. Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Edward B. Gaus
Represented By: Linnea M. Eberhart, PHV
Represented By: Scott A. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?