Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00492
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/11/17, ORDERING that David Johnson be AWARDED attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $7,200.00 under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/20/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment 16 is GRANTED; The Commissioner of Social Security CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment 21 is DENIED; This matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion; and The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Plaintiff. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/5/2017 DISCHARGING 19 Order to Show Cause in its entirety. (Washington, S)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/14/16 ORDERING that defendant shall show cause within 14 days, why her failure to file a cross-motion for summary judgment should not be deemed a waiver of (1) the right to file such a motion at any time, and (2) opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. (Washington, S)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/7/2016 ORDERING that defendant's responsive brief is due 12/7/2016. (Zignago, K.)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/9/2016 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 10/10/2016. (Michel, G.)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/10/16. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this ord er on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Peter Brixie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?