Cupp v. Harris, et al
Plaintiff: Cupp, James Edward Cupp and Lawrence Haven
Defendant: Harris, Xavier Becerra, Jesse Brucker, Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer No. 2, Scott Jones, County of Sacramento, City of Citrus Heights, Christopher W. Boyd, County of Placer, Mason, Edward N. Bonner, Christian Baerresen, Hintze, Thomas Lamb, Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer, Kamala Harris and Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer No. 1
Case Number: 2:2016cv00523
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/17/2019: On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #74 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 1/24/2019 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
January 17, 2019 Filing 77 REPLY by Xavier Becerra, Kamala Harris re #74 Motion to Dismiss. (O'Brien, Anthony)
January 10, 2019 Filing 76 OPPOSITION by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven to #74 Motion to Dismiss. (Gorski, Gary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 75 [DISREGARD FILED IN INCORRECT CASE, SHOULD BE IN 2:18-CV-02587-TLN-KJN] ANSWER with Jury Demand by Jesse Brucker.(Motooka, Wendy) Modified on 11/27/2018 (Washington, S).
November 20, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION to DISMISS by Xavier Becerra, Kamala Harris. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(O'Brien, Anthony)
November 20, 2018 Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2018: The Court is in receipt of Defendants Harris and Becerra's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #72 . The Motion as filed is deficient and Counsel for Defendants is directed to re-notice the Motion in compliance with Local Rule 230(a). Accordingly, the 12/20/2018 hearing date is VACATED. Counsel may refer to the Court's website for available law and motion dates. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 20, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION to DISMISS by Xavier Becerra, Kamala Harris. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(O'Brien, Anthony)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/6/18 GRANTING Defendants' Request to file their responses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by 11/20/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/6/18 RESCINDING in part the order of 10/11/18 #64 to require only Defendant Lamb, and not Defendant Baerresen to respond to the Third Amended Complaint no later than 11/5/2018 and that the previous order is RESCINDED as to Defendant Baerresen. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 5, 2018 Filing 69 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Kamala Harris. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Anthony)
November 5, 2018 Filing 68 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Thomas Lamb.(Lavra, John)
November 3, 2018 Filing 67 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Modify #64 Order, by Thomas Lamb. (Lavra, John) Modified on 11/5/2018 (Kaminski, H).
October 25, 2018 Filing 66 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gary William Gorski* *Law Offices of Gary W. Gorski* *3017 Douglas Blvd. Suite 150* *Roseville, CA 95661*. (Washington, S)
October 22, 2018 Filing 65 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven.(Gorski, Gary)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/10/2018 IT IS SO ORDERED Based upon the Stipulation of the plaintiff and the Citrus Heights individual Defendants, said Defendants are not required to respond to the current Second Amended Complaint, but shall respond to the Third Amended Complaint within 14 days of service of the complaint. (Reader, L)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/09/18 DENYING #35 , #39 , #40 Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunctions and DENYING #47 Motion to Strike as moot. (Benson, A.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 62 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re: Response to Second Amended Complaint by Christian Baerresen, Thomas Lamb. Attorney Lavra, John A. added. (Lavra, John)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/18 GRANTING #18 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is afforded thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Order. (Kaminski, H)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/18 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #16 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Christopher W. Boyd and City of Citrus Heights DISMISSED. (Kaminski, H)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/18 GRANTING #17 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants County of Placer, Edward N. Bonner, Hintze and Mason DISMISSED. (Kaminski, H)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/20/18 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #15 Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING #15 Motion to Sever. Defendants County of Sacramento and Scott Jones DISMISSED. Plaintiff is afforded thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file a severed and amended complaint for the Sixth and Seventh Causes of Action against Defendant Brucker.(Kaminski, H)
August 9, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Wendy M. Motooka. (Motooka, Wendy)
May 7, 2018 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Teresa Peterson in opposition to #39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #40 Motion for Preliminary Equitable and Injunctive Relief, #35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 5/7/2018 (Benson, A.).
May 7, 2018 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Alex Turcotte in opposition to #35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (O'Dea, Mark)
May 7, 2018 Filing 54 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 Sealed Event, #2 Sealed Event) (Zignago, K.)
May 7, 2018 Filing 53 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 Sealed Event, #2 Sealed Event) (Zignago, K.)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2018 GRANTING #50 Request to Seal Documents. The Declaration of Lieutenant Alex Turcotte, and Exhibit A attached thereto, in support of Opposition to Plaintiff James Cupp's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed on 4/19/2018, CM/ECF No. 45-1 is placed under SEAL. Counsel shall re-file the Declaration and Exhibit A attached thereto, with appropriate redactions. (Zignago, K.)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2018 GRANTING #49 Request to Seal Documents. The Declaration of Teresa Peterson in Support of Attorney General Becerra's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction, filed on 4/19/2018 as Document No. 42-1, is placed under SEAL. Counsel shall re-file the Declaration with any references to individual birth dates redacted. (Zignago, K.)
April 30, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Christian Baerresen, Christopher W. Boyd, City of Citrus Heights, Thomas Lamb. (O'Dea, Mark)
April 27, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Kamala Harris. (O'Brien, Anthony)
April 27, 2018 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/27/2018: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. #35 and #39 ) and Motion for Permanent Injunction (ECF No. #40 ) are hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 5/3/2018 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
April 26, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to STRIKE and OBJECTIONS by James Edward Cupp to Turcotte Declaration. (Gorski, Gary) Modified on 4/30/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 26, 2018 Filing 46 REPLY by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven re #45 Opposition to Motion, #44 Opposition to Motion, #43 Opposition to Motion. (Gorski, Gary)
April 19, 2018 Filing 45 OPPOSITION by Christian Baerresen, Christopher W. Boyd, City of Citrus Heights, Thomas Lamb to #35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney O'Dea, Mark added. (Attachments: #1 [SEALED per #52 Order] Declaration)(O'Dea, Mark) Modified on 5/7/2018 (Zignago, K.).
April 19, 2018 Filing 44 OPPOSITION by Edward N. Bonner to #39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia M. Reeves)(Reeves, Julia) Modified on 4/20/2018 (Becknal, R).
April 19, 2018 Filing 43 OPPOSITION by Jesse Brucker, County of Sacramento, Scott Jones to #40 Motion for Preliminary Equitable and Injunctive Relief. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Motooka, Wendy)
April 19, 2018 Filing 42 OPPOSITION by Kamala Harris to #35 , #39 , #40 Motions for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 [SEALED per #51 Order] Declaration)(O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 4/19/2018 (Becknal, R). Modified on 5/7/2018 (Zignago, K.).
April 3, 2018 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER re Granting #35 , #39 and #40 Motions for Preliminary Injunction. (Gorski, Gary) Modified on 4/4/2018 (Zignago, K.).
April 3, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for PRELIMINARY EQUITABLE and INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Against Defendants Kamala D. Harris (Now Xavier Becerra), Sacramento Deputy Sheriff Jesse Brucker, and Scott Jones by Lawrence Haven. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Of Lawrence "Wolf" Haven, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Gorski, Gary) Modified on 4/4/2018 (Zignago, K.).
April 2, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Against Defendants Kamala D. Harris (Now Xavier Becerra) and Edward N. Bonner by Lawrence Haven. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Haven, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Gorski, Gary) Modified on 4/4/2018 (Zignago, K.).
March 22, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of ATTORNEY Kevin A. Calia by Kamala Harris. (O'Brien, Anthony)
March 16, 2018 Filing 37 DECLARATION of James Cupp in support of #35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gorski, Gary) Modified on 3/19/2018 (Washington, S).
March 16, 2018 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by James Edward Cupp in SUPPORT of #35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Gorski, Gary) Modified on 3/19/2018 (Washington, S).
March 16, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by James Edward Cupp. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Gorski, Gary) Modified on 3/19/2018 (Washington, S).
October 23, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Anthony Paul O'Brien on behalf of Kamala Harris. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(O'Brien, Anthony)
October 17, 2017 Filing 33 STATEMENT of Supplemental Authority in Support of Attorney General's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Kamala Harris re #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Calia, Kevin)
August 2, 2017 Filing 32 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE adding Attorney Julia Reeves for Defendants County of Placer, Edward N. Bonner, Eric Hintz and Michael Mason. Attorney David K. Huskey TERMINATED. (Reeves, Julia) Modified on 8/3/2017 (Kastilahn, A).
January 10, 2017 Filing 31 STATEMENT of Supplemental Authority in Support of #18 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Kamala D. Harris. (Calia, Kevin) Modified on 1/11/2017 (Kaminski, H).
November 10, 2016 Filing 30 REPLY by Kamala D. Harris re #22 Opposition to Motion, #20 Declaration, #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Calia, Kevin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/10/2016: On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #15 , #16 , #17 and #18 ) are hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 11/17/2016 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 10, 2016 Filing 28 REPLY by Jesse Brucker, County of Sacramento, Scott Jones re #24 Opposition to Motion, #15 Motion to Dismiss. (Motooka, Wendy)
November 10, 2016 Filing 27 REPLY by Christian Baerresen, Christopher W. Boyd, City of Citrus Heights, Thomas Lamb re #16 Motion to Dismiss, #23 Opposition to Motion. (McDermott, Amanda)
November 10, 2016 Filing 26 REPLY by Edward N. Bonner, County of Placer, Hintze, Mason re #25 Opposition to Motion. (Huskey, David)
November 3, 2016 Filing 25 OPPOSITION by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven to #17 Motion to Dismiss. (Gorski, Gary)
November 3, 2016 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven to #15 Motion to Dismiss. (Gorski, Gary)
November 3, 2016 Filing 23 OPPOSITION by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven to #16 Motion to Dismiss. (Gorski, Gary)
November 3, 2016 Filing 22 OPPOSITION by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven to #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Gorski, Gary)
October 3, 2016 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2016: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Defendants Jesse Brucker, County of Sacramento, and Scott Jones' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #15 ) is hereby RESET for 11/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. All further briefing shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230 and the new hearing date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 30, 2016 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Kevin A. Calia in SUPPORT OF #18 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Calia, Kevin) Modified on 10/12/2016 (Zignago, K.).
September 30, 2016 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Kamala D. Harris in SUPPORT of #18 MOTION to DISMISS. (Calia, Kevin)
September 30, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Kamala D. Harris. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Calia, Kevin)
September 30, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to DISMISS by Edward N. Bonner, County of Placer, Hintze, Mason. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Huskey, David)
September 30, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS by Christian Baerresen, Christopher W. Boyd, City of Citrus Heights, Thomas Lamb. Attorney McDermott, Amanda Lynn added. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(McDermott, Amanda)
September 29, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS by Jesse Brucker, County of Sacramento, Scott Jones. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Motooka, Wendy)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/15/16 ORDERING Defendants response to Second Amended Complaint is due by 9/30/2016.(Washington, S)
September 12, 2016 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Kamala D. Harris. Attorney Calia, Kevin A. added. (Calia, Kevin)
August 15, 2016 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, against all defendants by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Gorski, Gary) Modified on 8/16/2016 (Michel, G.).
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/11/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiffs shall have leave to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint, due by 8/15/2016; and Defendants shall have until 9/15/2016 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint.(Reader, L)
August 9, 2016 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Allowng Plaintiffs to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint by Jesse Brucker, County of Sacramento, Scott Jones. (Motooka, Wendy)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/28/16 ORDERING the current date of 7/25/16, for filing a response to the First Amended Complaint is hereby vacated; Plaintiffs shall email a proposed Second Amended Complaint to defendants on or before 8/1/16; If consensus is reached, the parties will stipulate for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint, with the Second Amended Complaint to be filed no later than 8/15/16; Defendants' responses (to either the FAC or SAC) shall be due on 9/15/16; the current date for filing the Joint Status Report is hereby vacated; and the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 10/1/16. (Becknal, R)
July 25, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven. (Gorski, Gary)
June 27, 2016 Filing 7 STIPULATION To Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Jesse Brucker, County of Sacramento, Scott Jones. Attorney Motooka, Wendy M. added. (Motooka, Wendy)
June 6, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Edward N. Bonner, Jesse Brucker, County of Placer, County of Sacramento, Hintze, Scott Jones, Mason* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gary W. Gorski* *Law Offices of Gary W. Gorski* *3017 Douglas Blvd., Suite 150* *Roseville CA 95661*. (Zignago, K.)
June 3, 2016 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by James Edward Cupp, Lawrence Haven. Attorney Gorski, Gary William added.(Gorski, Gary)
March 11, 2016 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Marciel, M)
March 11, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Christian Baerresen; Christopher W. Boyd; City of Citrus Heights; Kamala D. Harris; Thomas Lamb; Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer, Badge Number 323; Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer, who prepared Report Number CH 14-02589 on 3/26/2014; Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer No. 1; Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer No. 2* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gary W. Gorski* *Law Offices of Gary W. Gorski* *3017 Douglas Boulevard, Suite 150* *Roseville, CA 95661* (Marciel, M)
March 11, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by James Edward Cupp (Gorski, Gary)
March 11, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by plaintiff James Edward Cupp; DEMAND for Jury Trial. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6363253) (Gorski, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cupp v. Harris, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Cupp
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Represented By: Daniel M. Karalash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Haven
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Brucker
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Citrus Heights
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Represented By: Mark O'Dea
Represented By: Amanda Lynn McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Boyd
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Represented By: Mark O'Dea
Represented By: Amanda Lynn McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Placer
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward N. Bonner
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Baerresen
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Represented By: Mark O'Dea
Represented By: Amanda Lynn McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hintze
Represented By: Julia Reeves
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lamb
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Represented By: Mark O'Dea
Represented By: Amanda Lynn McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Represented By: Kevin A. Calia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Citrus Heights Police Officer No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?